Global Patent Index - EP 0952390 A3

EP 0952390 A3 2001-04-04 - Line illumination system

Title (en)

Line illumination system

Title (de)

Lichtbandsystem

Title (fr)

Chemin lumineux

Publication

EP 0952390 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107270 A

Priority

DE 29806967 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952390A2] The lighting system has a steel plate light-holder (2), which is detachably connected to a steel-plate profiled support (1). A parabolic reflector area (11) formed on the profiled support directs the light rays in the required direction. The profiled support has a reflective coating at least on the side of the reflector area that faces the light source. The profiled support has two arms (12) of equal length arranged at an acute angle to each other. The ends of the arms have contact surfaces (14) for the lamp to be fixed to the profiled support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21V 17/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/18 (2006.01); F21V 3/00 (2006.01); F21V 11/02 (2006.01); F21V 15/015 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/18 (2013.01); F21S 4/20 (2016.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 17/164 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); F21V 11/02 (2013.01); F21V 15/015 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2113/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806967 U1 19980610; EP 0952390 A2 19991027; EP 0952390 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090913

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRILUX GMBH & CO. KG

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060206

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI