Global Patent Index - EP 0952418 B1

EP 0952418 B1 2003-06-04 - Multifunctional heat exchanger, particularly for motor vehicle

Title (en)

Multifunctional heat exchanger, particularly for motor vehicle

Title (de)

Multifunktioneller Wärmetauscher, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur multifonction, en particulier pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0952418 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99107729 A

Priority

FR 9804921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952418A1] The heat exchanger consists of a single core (1) of tubes (2a, 2b, 2i) and fins (3), and is divided into at least two sections (F1, F2) carrying different fluids, cooled by a common cooling air flow (F3). The ends (5a, 5b) of the tubes are connected to at least two separate collector plates (6 12) separated by an inactive tube (2i) and forming part of separate collector chambers (7, 13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0443 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0082 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952418 A1 19991027; EP 0952418 B1 20030604; DE 69908483 D1 20030710; DE 69908483 T2 20040513; FR 2777643 A1 19991022; FR 2777643 B1 20000630

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908483 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010622

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI