Global Patent Index - EP 0952423 B1

EP 0952423 B1 2002-09-04 - Decoration panel for a firework

Title (en)

Decoration panel for a firework

Title (de)

Verzierungsplatte für Feuerwerk

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réalisation d'un panneau décor artifice

Publication

EP 0952423 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400992 A

Priority

FR 9805034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952423A1] The system consists of a base in the form of a rigid grid (6) of square mesh (7) holding supports (10) for the tableau igniters (11). The grid is self-supporting and surrounded by a frame (1), and the supports can be in the form of coil springs with close coils which screw into the mesh holes and are held under tension Two or more adjacent igniters can be connected by a strip (19) of a folded adhesive material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 4/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952423 A1 19991027; EP 0952423 B1 20020904; ES 2181370 T3 20030216; FR 2777988 A1 19991029; FR 2777988 B1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070422

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060424

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060424

2005-03-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181370 T3

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-08-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI