Global Patent Index - EP 0952495 A4

EP 0952495 A4 2000-05-10 - POLYMER-BASE TONER AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

POLYMER-BASE TONER AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

POLYMERE ENTHALTENDER TONER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

TONER A BASE DE POLYMERE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE DERNIER

Publication

EP 0952495 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97909708 A

Priority

  • JP 9703972 W
  • JP 31009196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952495A1] A polymerized toner of core-shell structure, comprising core particles composed of colored polymer particles, which comprise a polyfunctional ester compound formed of a trifunctional or still higher polyfunctional polyhydric alcohol and a carboxylic acid, and a colorant, and shell which is formed of a polymer having a glass transition temperature higher than that of a polymer component making up the core particles and covers each of the core particles, a production process thereof, an image forming process comprising using the polymerized toner, and an image forming apparatus containing the polymerized toner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/093 (2006.01); G03G 9/097 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08782 (2013.01); G03G 9/09314 (2013.01); G03G 9/09371 (2013.01); G03G 9/09733 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952495 A1 19991027; EP 0952495 A4 20000510; EP 0952495 B1 20090114; DE 69739222 D1 20090305; EP 2042932 A1 20090401; JP 3670667 B2 20050713; KR 100533491 B1 20051206; KR 20000053037 A 20000825; WO 9820396 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69739222

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69739222 P 20090305

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZEON CORPORATION

2008-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OGAWA, TOKUDAI,RES. & DEV. CENTER

2008-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANAGIDA, NOBORU,RES. & DEV. CENTER

2008-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ENCAPSULATED TONER AND ITS PRODUCTION PROCESS

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2000-05-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990528

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB