Global patent index - EP 0952596 A3

EP 0952596 A3 2000-06-14 - Low voltage circuit breaker with insertable contact rail

Title (en)

Low voltage circuit breaker with insertable contact rail

Title (de)

Niederspannungs-Leistungsschalter mit einer einschiebbaren Stromschiene

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur basse tension avec rail de contact enfichable

Publication

EP 0952596 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250134 A

Priority

DE 19819165 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952596A2] A low-voltage (LV) circuit-breaker has a contact system in a housing and an insertable or withdrawable busbar for connecting the contact system with an external circuit. The upper fixed breaker-contact is provided with an arcing-horn (2) and the busbar of this contact has at least one single=piece abutment (4) which abuts against a mounting surface of the rear wall of the housing after insertion of the busbar into the entrance opening (5) of the rear-wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/06; H01H 1/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 9/46 (2006.01); H01H 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2013.01); H01H 9/46 (2013.01); H01H 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952596 A2 19991027; EP 0952596 A3 20000614; DE 19819165 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070105

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI