Global Patent Index - EP 0952598 A3

EP 0952598 A3 2000-05-10 - Control device with metallised push buttons

Title (en)

Control device with metallised push buttons

Title (de)

Bedienvorrichtung mit metallisierten Tasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande avec touches métallisées

Publication

EP 0952598 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107779 A

Priority

DE 19817958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952598A2] The arrangement has a contact mat (4) with keys (11) that are associated with defined functions. At least one key is metallised. The metallisation is produced by providing the metallised key with an electrically conducting coating in a first step and applying the metallisation in a second step. There are different regions (5-8) with keys with different metallisations produced by providing the keys with the same metallisation with a common electrically conducting coating. An Independent claim is also included for a method of producing a control arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2006.01); H01H 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 9/0235 (2013.01); H01H 2209/0021 (2013.01); H01H 2209/07 (2013.01); H01H 2219/034 (2013.01); H01H 2229/014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952598 A2 19991027; EP 0952598 A3 20000510; EP 0952598 B1 20060906; DE 19817958 A1 19991104; DE 59913827 D1 20061019; ES 2272025 T3 20070416

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-08-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2272025 T3

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913827 P 20061019

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2006-09-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI