Global Patent Index - EP 0952639 A3

EP 0952639 A3 2001-02-07 - Female connector for an electrical connector

Title (en)

Female connector for an electrical connector

Title (de)

Steckdose für eine elektrische Steckverbindung

Title (fr)

Connecteur femelle pour un connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0952639 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107543 A

Priority

DE 19817871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952639A2] The socket has a socket housing (1) with a central insertion opening (5) for a plug and a contact insert and accommodates a switch carrier (8) with a microswitch (9) on a side wall (2). An actuation element mounted on the carrier has a triggering section (14) protruding into the insertion opening and engages the microswitch actuating pin (10) via an actuation surface. The actuating element is a spring yoke (11) with one arm fixed to the carrier and one movable arm with a movable end forming the actuation surface protruding wedge-like between the actuation pin and a carrier thrust surface (24) and connected to the triggering section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7035 (2013.01); H01R 23/10 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952639 A2 19991027; EP 0952639 A3 20010207; DE 19817871 A1 19991104; DE 19817871 C2 20011115

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI