Global Patent Index - EP 0952778 B1

EP 0952778 B1 2002-11-13 - FRAME TO RECEIVE A PART TO BE CARRIED

Title (en)

FRAME TO RECEIVE A PART TO BE CARRIED

Title (de)

GESTELL ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ZU TRAGENDEN TEILES

Title (fr)

CHASSIS DESTINE A RECEVOIR UNE PIECE A PORTER

Publication

EP 0952778 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98903011 A

Priority

  • DE 19701477 A
  • EP 9800225 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19701477C1] The invention relates to a frame for receiving a part to be carried, comprising a pair of angle sections (1) extending parallel to each other, which each have two sides (2, 3) meeting along an edge and at a certain angle, a groove (4) which is parallel to the edge and has a longitudinal element (5) that is inclined towards to the two sides (2, 3) and extends through the edge, and a transverse element (6) extending on both sides of the longitudinal element (5) at the root of the longitudinal element (5), comprising a first and a second section (13, 13'), screws (44) engaging in each of the longitudinal elements (5) of the grooves (4), as well as locking pieces (20) which are arranged in the transverse elements (6) and interact with said screws, for attaching the part to be carried to the frame. The locking pieces (20) with a first area (27) and a second area (27') rest against the two sections (13, 13'). Said two sections (13, 13') of the transverse element (6) and the adjoining two areas (27, 27') of the locking piece (20) are inclined towards each other in such a way that there is a positive fit between the locking piece (20) and the transverse element (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/26 (2006.01); A47B 57/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19701477 C1 19980326; AT 227530 T 20021115; EP 0952778 A1 19991103; EP 0952778 B1 20021113; JP 2001508683 A 20010703; US 6216891 B1 20010417; WO 9831256 A1 19980723

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-09-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRUMPF KREUZER MEDIZIN SYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-01-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040116

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-08 [REG GB 711G] CORRECTION ALLOWED (SECT. 117/1977)

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUMPF KREUZER MEDIZIN SYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227530 T 20021115

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE