Global Patent Index - EP 0952954 B1

EP 0952954 B1 2001-04-11 - COMPACT ESCALATOR

Title (en)

COMPACT ESCALATOR

Title (de)

KOMPAKTE FAHRTREPPE

Title (fr)

ESCALIER MECANIQUE COMPACT

Publication

EP 0952954 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902142 A

Priority

  • HU 9800006 W
  • HU 9700182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831627A1] The compact escalator according to the invention is provided with stair steps on different levels, wherein the height of each step (2) is variable, the steps (2) contain a fixed lower (4) and a vertically movable upper element (3), a lifting device is between the lower (4) and upper element (3) and said lifting device is connected to a control unit provided with at least a direction switch. Said lifting devices are hinged joint type mechanisms (6). Said lifting devices are pulley block type mechanisms. The lifting devices are provided with electric motor (5). The lifting devices are provided with hydraulic or pneumatic cylinders (13). The lifting devices are provided with starter and dead-end switches. Said starter switches are activated by weight sensors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/0869 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831627 A1 19980723; AT 200468 T 20010415; CA 2278186 A1 19980723; DE 69800692 D1 20010517; DE 69800692 T2 20020529; EP 0952954 A1 19991103; EP 0952954 B1 20010411; HU 218933 B 20010129; HU 9700182 A1 19980828; HU 9700182 D0 19970328

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-01-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-01-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030115

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800692 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200468 T 20010415

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000410

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI