Global Patent Index - EP 0953034 B1

EP 0953034 B1 2001-05-23 - LIQUID COMPOSITION AND ITS USE AS MAGNETO-RHEOLOGICAL LIQUID

Title (en)

LIQUID COMPOSITION AND ITS USE AS MAGNETO-RHEOLOGICAL LIQUID

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DER FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ALS MAGNETORHEOLOGISCHE FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION LIQUIDE ET SON UTILISATION COMME LIQUIDE MAGNETO-RHEOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0953034 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97953659 A

Priority

  • DE 9702992 W
  • DE 19654461 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19654461A1] The invention relates to the preparation of liquid compositions containing dispersed particular solid matters, which are characterized by an extremely low sedimentation proprensity of solid matters dispersed therein. Said compositions, which contain ferromagnetic particular solid matters, can be used as magneto-rheological liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 119/24; H01F 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 119/24 (2006.01); C10M 105/02 (2006.01); C10M 125/04 (2006.01); C10M 125/12 (2006.01); C10M 149/20 (2006.01); H01F 1/34 (2006.01); H01F 1/44 (2006.01); C10N 10/16 (2006.01); C10N 20/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/447 (2013.01); H01F 1/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19654461 A1 19980702; DE 59703627 D1 20010628; EP 0953034 A1 19991103; EP 0953034 B1 20010523; JP 2001507388 A 20010605; JP 4502151 B2 20100714; US 6245253 B1 20010612; WO 9829521 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171219

2018-01-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171219

2017-12-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703627

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703627 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001010

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB