Global Patent Index - EP 0953111 B1

EP 0953111 B1 2001-12-19 - AXIAL PISTON MACHINE WITH DAMPING ELEMENT FOR THE INCLINED OR WOBBLE PLATE

Title (en)

AXIAL PISTON MACHINE WITH DAMPING ELEMENT FOR THE INCLINED OR WOBBLE PLATE

Title (de)

AXIALKOLBENMASCHINE MIT DÄMPFUNGSELEMENT FÜR DIE SCHRÄG- ODER TAUMELSCHEIBE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PISTONS AXIAUX COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR LE DISQUE INCLINE OU OSCILLANT

Publication

EP 0953111 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97910399 A

Priority

  • DE 19645580 A
  • EP 9705396 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19645580C1] The invention concerns an axial piston machine (1) which comprises a cylinder block (2) having cylinder bores (3, 4) in which pistons (5, 6) are movably guided, said pistons (5, 6) being supported on an inclined or wobble plate (25) in order to perform a lifting movement. The axial piston machine (1) further comprises a pivot device (31) for varying the inclination of the inclined or wobble plate (25) by pivoting about a pivot axis (27). The development according to the invention is provided with a damping element (41) which comprises a damping piston (40) which acts on the inclined or wobble plate (25) and is movably disposed in a damping cylinder (42) which is connected to a pressure fluid reservoir (48) via a throttle element (47) and a non-return valve (44) disposed parallel thereto. The non-return valve (44) enables pressure fluid to flow in an unthrottled manner from the pressure fluid reservoir (48) into the damping cylinder (42) and prevents the pressure fluid from flowing out of the damping cylinder (42) in an unthrottled manner by bypassing the throttle element (47). In this way, a damped pivot movement of the inclined or wobble plate (25) is brought about.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/32; F03C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/22 (2006.01); F03C 1/40 (2006.01); F04B 1/26 (2006.01); F04B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/324 (2013.01); F03C 1/0686 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19645580 C1 19980402; EP 0953111 A1 19991103; EP 0953111 B1 20011219; JP 2001503493 A 20010313; JP 3956058 B2 20070808; KR 20000022332 A 20000425; US 6174139 B1 20010116; WO 9820258 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705927 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981117

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE