Global Patent Index - EP 0953199 B1

EP 0953199 B1 2001-12-05 - HIGH-VOLTAGE POWER SWITCH WITH AN AXIALLY DISPLACEABLE FIELD ELECTRODE

Title (en)

HIGH-VOLTAGE POWER SWITCH WITH AN AXIALLY DISPLACEABLE FIELD ELECTRODE

Title (de)

HOCHSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINER AXIAL VERSCHIEBBAREN FELDELEKTRODE

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR HAUTE TENSION A ELECTRODE DE CHAMP MOBILE AXIALEMENT

Publication

EP 0953199 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98907851 A

Priority

  • DE 9800190 W
  • DE 19702822 A
  • DE 19727850 A
  • DE 19741660 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832142A1] The invention relates to a high-voltage power switch with arcing contact pieces (1, 3) which can be moved in relation to each other, and an axially moveable insulating nozzle (5). An axially displaceable field electrode (15) is provided on the opposite side to the driving gear. Said rod is coupled to the axially moveable insulating nozzle (5), and acts upon a gearing which consists of a pivotable lever (20) with control pins (21), of a gate guide (23) and a second connector rod (21) coupled to the control pin (21) and to the field electrode (15). For supplementary drive of the second arcing contact piece (25), which is surrounded by the field electrode (15), the first connecting rod (18) also acts, by means of a pin (35), upon corner gears which consist of a double armed lever (40) configured at one end like a fork (46, 47), facing towards the gate-like guide of the pin, and a pendulum element (41, 42) at the other end of the lever, connected to the second arcing contact piece (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/245 (2013.01); H01H 33/7023 (2013.01); H01H 2033/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832142 A1 19980723; BR 9807492 A 20000321; BR 9807492 B1 20110628; EP 0953199 A1 19991103; EP 0953199 B1 20011205; US 6177643 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802323

2017-09-29 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: WERNER-VON-SIEMENS-STRASSE 1, 80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170404

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-01-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802323 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010503

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI