Global Patent Index - EP 0953306 A3

EP 0953306 A3 2000-06-14 - Partition curtain, specially gather-up curtain for sport, event, exhibition, industrial halls or similar

Title (en)

Partition curtain, specially gather-up curtain for sport, event, exhibition, industrial halls or similar

Title (de)

Trennvorhang, insbesondere hochraffbarer Trennvorhang für Sporthallen, Veranstaltungs- und Messehallen, Industriehallen, Säle od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Rideau de séparation, en particulier rideau plissé pour salles ou halls de sport, de spectacle ou industriels

Publication

EP 0953306 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106974 A

Priority

DE 19819262 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953306A2] The curtain (10) has longitudinal profiles (11) from which the curtain material (12) hangs which are joined together by pulley consoles (16). Together they form a load-supporting structure (17) which not only holds the curtain but also the drive motor and its components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 5/032 (2006.01); A47H 5/14 (2006.01); A47H 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/0692 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953306 A2 19991103; EP 0953306 A3 20000614; DE 19819262 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI