Global Patent Index - EP 0953311 A3

EP 0953311 A3 2000-12-20 - Dispenser for pasty products

Title (en)

Dispenser for pasty products

Title (de)

Cremespender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de crème

Publication

EP 0953311 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107864 A

Priority

DE 29807698 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953311A2] A tube (11) of toothpaste is held inside the dispenser casing (2) by a support plate (3). This support plate contains a hole which surrounds and is in contact with the stopper (12) sealing the tube. A toothed bar and a guide in the tube surface allow two press rolls (18) with toothed wheels to be moved into contact with the end of the tube. These rolls are rotated from outside the dispenser and are used to squeeze toothpaste out of the tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/18; B65D 35/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/00 (2006.01); B65D 35/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/00 (2013.01); B65D 35/285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807698 U1 19980730; EP 0953311 A2 19991103; EP 0953311 A3 20001220; US 6089405 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050422

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010519

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 5/18 A, 7B 65D 35/28 B

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI