Global patent index - EP 0953367 A3

EP 0953367 A3 2000-01-19 - Permanently presurized manual fire extinguisher

Title (en)

Permanently presurized manual fire extinguisher

Title (de)

Dauerdruckhandfeuerlöscher

Title (fr)

Extincteur d'incendie à main sous pression permanente

Publication

EP 0953367 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120378 A

Priority

DE 29807814 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953367A2] The fire extinguisher (100) has a common container (10) to hold extinguishing medium (12) and propellant (11) and a device (13) for manual operation. A first riser pipe (17), for discharging the extinguishing medium, extends from the control device to near the floor (18) of the container. The extinguisher has a device, which may be a sprinkler head or a valve (20) with a fuse, which releases the extinguishing medium under the action of heat, and which is connected to a similar riser pipe (23). The device for manual operation is a hand-operated valve, which has a spray head (14) and a handle (15), which is combined with a control lever (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 13/62; A62C 13/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/76 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953367 A2 19991103; EP 0953367 A3 20000119; EP 0953367 B1 20090121; DE 59814337 D1 20090312

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-12-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091022

2009-03-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59814337

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20090312

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040303

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI