Global Patent Index - EP 0953380 A3

EP 0953380 A3 2000-06-07 - Method and device for scraping the crystals from a centrifuge drum

Title (en)

Method and device for scraping the crystals from a centrifuge drum

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausräumen des Kristallisats aus einer Zentrifugentrommel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour racler les cristaux d'un tambour de centrifugation

Publication

EP 0953380 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102995 A

Priority

DE 19819065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819065C1] In the removal of almost dry residues from an intermittently-operated, e.g. sugar beet fiber, centrifuge (1), a blade (7a) directed against the centrifuge direction of rotation (5) is lowered into the centrifuge chamber. The blade is advanced towards the rotating centrifuge inner face and extends almost over the full height (h) of the surface. The pneumatically-operated blade removes the (especially sugar beet fiber) residue (9), which is progressively peeled from the centrifuge wall. When the blade makes first contact with the centrifuge wall, it is withdrawn from contact. An Independent claim is given for the assembly used for implementation of the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819065 C1 19991014; EP 0953380 A2 19991103; EP 0953380 A3 20000607; EP 0953380 B1 20020821; US 6177021 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI