Global Patent Index - EP 0953390 A3

EP 0953390 A3 2000-11-22 - Rivet setting tool

Title (en)

Rivet setting tool

Title (de)

Nietsetzgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de rivetage

Publication

EP 0953390 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102537 A

Priority

DE 19818756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953390A2] The rivet gun has an electric motor (3) with an output shaft (12) coupled to the rivet driving device via an intermediate drive converting the rotation of the motor output shaft into a linear movement of the rivet driving device. At least one flywheel (42) is coupled to the motor output shaft or the intermediate drive via a releasable coupling. The conversion ratio of the intermediate drive provides rotation of flywheel at double the rotation of drive motor output shaft. An Independent claim for an operating method for a rivet gun is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/26; B21J 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/16 (2006.01); B21J 15/04 (2006.01); B21J 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/26 (2013.01); B21J 15/043 (2013.01); B21J 15/048 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53752 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953390 A2 19991103; EP 0953390 A3 20001122; AU 2379099 A 19991111; AU 718556 B2 20000413; BR 9901296 A 20000104; DE 19818756 A1 19991104; JP 3124756 B2 20010115; JP H11320016 A 19991124; US 6237390 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 15/26 A, 7B 21J 15/04 B

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI