Global Patent Index - EP 0953510 B1

EP 0953510 B1 2002-09-18 - Case

Title (en)

Case

Title (de)

Gefache

Title (fr)

Case

Publication

EP 0953510 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102058 A

Priority

DE 29807554 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953510A2] A novel securely-interlocking compartment system comprises long side sections (10) and transverse sections (20) made of a flexible, shock-absorbing foam. Preferably, the long side sections have slots (11) into which the transverse sections are inserted. The latter have grooves (21, 22) on either side, mating with the end sections of the slots. The material used is a resilient, closed-cell waterproof foam. It can be cut by water jet technology or by stamping out. Suitable materials include polyolefins such as homo- or copolymers of ethylene, propylene and their mixtures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807554 U1 19980723; EP 0953510 A2 19991103; EP 0953510 A3 19991110; EP 0953510 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170415

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902712 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010910

2000-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB IT NL

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT NL

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI