Global Patent Index - EP 0953530 A3

EP 0953530 A3 2000-06-07 - Roll winder device, especially for a roll slitter

Title (en)

Roll winder device, especially for a roll slitter

Title (de)

Rollenwickeleinrichtung, insbesondere für einen Rollenschneider

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' enroulement, spécialement pour une refendeuse

Publication

EP 0953530 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107151 A

Priority

DE 19818944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953530A2] The winder unit (1) has at least one support unit (4) which is formed by at least one support roller (5,6) which is located on its axis laterally in the machine frame. Stand arrangements (9,10) are provided on the axial ends of the support rollers. At least one lateral member (11,14,15) is formed as a seal box (11) which is located beneath the wider bed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2401/231 (2013.01); B65H 2402/40 (2013.01); B65H 2406/13 (2013.01); B65H 2406/131 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953530 A2 19991103; EP 0953530 A3 20000607; EP 0953530 B1 20030625; DE 19818944 A1 19991111; US 6705562 B1 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060413

2005-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906056 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000513

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI