Global Patent Index - EP 0953660 B1

EP 0953660 B1 2003-06-18 - Divisible hollow copolyester fibers and divided copolyester fibers, woven or knitted fabric, artificial leather and nonwoven fabric comprising same

Title (en)

Divisible hollow copolyester fibers and divided copolyester fibers, woven or knitted fabric, artificial leather and nonwoven fabric comprising same

Title (de)

Teilbare Hohlfasern und geteilte Fasern aus Copolyester, daraus hergestellte Gewebe, Gewirke, Kunstleder und Vlies

Title (fr)

Fibres creuses divisibles et fibres divisées en copolyester, étoffe tissée, tricotée ou non tissée et cuir artificiel les comprenant

Publication

EP 0953660 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99303358 A

Priority

JP 12052098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953660A1] Divisible hollow copolyester fibers having a satisfactory processing property, for example, carding property and capable of being divided by applying a mechanical stress thereto into fibril-like thin fibers, each include a hollow portion surrounded by a shell portion and extending along the longitudinal axes of the hollow fibers, wherein the shell portion is made from a copolyester of an acid component including terephthalic acid and 1 to 6 molar % of a sulfonate group-containing dicarboxylic acid, with a diol component including ethylene glycol; the hollow fibers have (1) thickness of 0.56 to 8.89 d tex (0.5 to 8.0 denier), (2) a hollow ratio of 25/100 or more, (3) a crystallization degree of 20% or more, and (4) a crystal size in (010) plane of 4 nm or more; and the shell portions each have a plurality of cracks intermittently extending along the longitudinal axes of the hollow fibers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/84; D01D 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/24 (2006.01); D01F 6/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/24 (2013.01); D01F 6/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953660 A1 19991103; EP 0953660 B1 20030618; DE 69908856 D1 20030724; DE 69908856 T2 20040506; HK 1023153 A1 20031003; ID 27466 A 20010412; KR 100557271 B1 20060307; KR 19990083556 A 19991125; TW 554097 B 20030921

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908856

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908856

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908856 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI