Global Patent Index - EP 0953665 A3

EP 0953665 A3 2000-05-03 - Apparatus for automatically changing bobbin cases in quilting machines

Title (en)

Apparatus for automatically changing bobbin cases in quilting machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wechseln von Spulenkapseln in einer Steppmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour remplacer les capsules de canette dans une machine à piquer

Publication

EP 0953665 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107341 A

Priority

IT BO980269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953665A2] The apparatus allows to automatically change the bobbin cases in quilting machines. The apparatus comprises a pick-up element (37) which is mounted on a carriage which can move between a magazine (38) which contains full cases and the hook assembly (3) of a sewing machine in which the empty case is to be replaced. The pick-up element (37) extracts the empty case and deposits it into a specifically provided container (64). It is further positioned at the magazine (38), from which it removes a full case and transfers the case into the hook assembly (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 59/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 59/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 59/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953665 A2 19991103; EP 0953665 A3 20000503; EP 0953665 B1 20030924; DE 69911495 D1 20031030; DE 69911495 T2 20040701; ES 2209268 T3 20040616; IT 1299993 B1 20000404; IT BO980269 A1 19991102; IT BO980269 D0 19980430; US 6041725 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69911495

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140421

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140421

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209268 T3

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911495 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI