Global Patent Index - EP 0953666 A3

EP 0953666 A3 2000-08-23 - Method and apparatus for the wet treatment of textile material of indefinite length

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the wet treatment of textile material of indefinite length

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Einbringen von Flotte in Textilgut unbegrenzter Länge

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour le traitement au mouillé de matière textile de longueur indéterminée

Publication

EP 0953666 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105985 A

Priority

DE 19819075 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953666A2] For a wet treatment of fabrics, of unlimited lengths, it is immersed in a bath during its movement to take up a given fluid volume in a set concentration. On leaving the bath, surplus fluid drops off, and a following vacuum suction removes the remaining surplus fluid. The level of the vacuum in the extraction tube is continuously controlled according to the fluid level in the immersion bath, so that the fabric has a constant and defined residual fluid content. The textile fabric moves over the extraction pipe (15) at the vacuum unit. The underpressure at the extraction pipe (15) is continuously controlled according to the fluid level (2) in the level indicator section (12) at the immersion bath (11). The level indicator section (12) is linked to the immersion bath (11) by a pipe (9), and it has a fluid level monitor (13). A control unit (16), after the fluid level indicator section (12), operates a drive (17) for the vacuum pump (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 15/04; D06B 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 15/04 (2006.01); D06B 23/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/28 (2013.01); D06B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953666 A2 19991103; EP 0953666 A3 20000823; DE 19819075 A1 19991111; DE 19819075 C2 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030204

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI