Global Patent Index - EP 0953673 A3

EP 0953673 A3 2000-06-07 - Agents for and methods of processing synthetic fibers

Title (en)

Agents for and methods of processing synthetic fibers

Title (de)

Mittel und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Kunstfasern

Title (fr)

Agent et procédé pour le traitement des fibres synthétiques

Publication

EP 0953673 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303196 A

Priority

JP 13457598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953673A2] An agent containing a polyether compound, a straight-chain polyether modified polyorganosiloxane of a specified kind and an ionic surfactant at specified ratios are applied at a specified rate to synthetic fibers subjected to a heat treatment such as false twisting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/647; D02G 1/02; D02J 13/00; D06M 13/285; D06M 13/46; D06M 15/53; D06M 15/657

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/148 (2006.01); D06M 13/248 (2006.01); D06M 13/256 (2006.01); D06M 13/285 (2006.01); D06M 13/288 (2006.01); D06M 13/313 (2006.01); D06M 13/46 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 13/51 (2006.01); D06M 13/513 (2006.01); D06M 15/53 (2006.01); D06M 15/647 (2006.01); D06M 15/657 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/12 (2006.01); D06M 101/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/657 (2013.01); D02G 1/026 (2013.01); D06M 7/00 (2013.01); D06M 13/285 (2013.01); D06M 13/288 (2013.01); D06M 13/313 (2013.01); D06M 13/46 (2013.01); D06M 15/53 (2013.01); D06M 15/647 (2013.01); D06M 2101/32 (2013.01); D06M 2101/34 (2013.01); D06M 2200/00 (2013.01); D06M 2200/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953673 A2 19991103; EP 0953673 A3 20000607; EP 0953673 B1 20011010; CN 1114006 C 20030709; CN 1233686 A 19991103; DE 69900339 D1 20011115; DE 69900339 T2 20020704; JP 3907313 B2 20070418; JP H11315480 A 19991116; KR 100539727 B1 20051229; TW 559633 B 20031101

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120426

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120426

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900339

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI