Global Patent Index - EP 0953678 A3

EP 0953678 A3 2001-02-07 - Press blanket

Title (en)

Press blanket

Title (de)

Pressmantel

Title (fr)

Courroie de pressage

Publication

EP 0953678 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104438 A

Priority

DE 19819526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953678A2] A new press mantle of a roller for water extraction from a wet fiber web, of paper or cardboard, has grooves (14) or blind drillings at the roller mantle surface (12). The side walls (18) are chamfered (20) and/or rounded (20') on a curved line at the opening, to prevent compression of the opening when the mantle is under pressure. The chamfer (20) edge length (y), towards the depth of the groove/drilling, is 1-3 times and preferably twice the edge length (x) along the longitudinal direction. The chamfer edge length on the longitudinal line (x) is 0.1-0.3 mm, especially 0.2 mm. With a rounded opening edge (20'), the length (y) of the edge in relation to a tangent is 1-3 times, preferably twice the edge length (x) along the longitudinal line which is 0.1-0.3 mm and preferably 0.2 mm. The chamfered/rounded edge (20,20') length (y) towards the depth of the groove/drilling is set to give a cylindrical wall section (24) between the base (22) of the groove (14) or drilling and the start of the chamfered/rounded edge. The curvature of the rounded edge (20') follows a circular arc or an involute. The chamfered/rounded edge (20,20') is at the outer edge of each groove (14) or blind drilling, or it is offset inwards towards the depth by a given gap from the mantle surface as a ring step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/08; D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/00 (2006.01); D21F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0227 (2013.01); D21F 3/083 (2013.01); D21F 3/086 (2013.01); Y10S 462/901 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24669 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24694 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953678 A2 19991103; EP 0953678 A3 20010207; EP 0953678 B1 20050608; EP 0953678 B2 20110504; AT 297484 T 20050615; DE 19819526 A1 19991104; JP 4331315 B2 20090916; JP H11335992 A 19991207; US 6416630 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110306

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110305

2011-10-11 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-07 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59912133

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-05-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB SE

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100311

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-05-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20060304

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912133 P 20050714

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB SE

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030617

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI GB SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI