Global Patent Index - EP 0953679 B1

EP 0953679 B1 2002-09-11 - Paper strengthening agent and paper strengthening method

Title (en)

Paper strengthening agent and paper strengthening method

Title (de)

Papierfestigungsmittel und Verfahren zur Festigung von Papier

Title (fr)

Agent de renforcement pour papier et procédé de renforcement de papier

Publication

EP 0953679 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98111753 A

Priority

  • JP 12664398 A
  • JP 17532898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953679A1] There is provided a paper strengthening agent comprising a polymer dispersion manufactured by polymerizing a monomer containing (meth)acrylic acid in an aqueous solution and precipitating the produced polymer as fine particles, and which is added to a paper layer after a paper layer is formed, wherein (1) the concentration of the (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymer in said polymer dispersion is at least 5 wt%, (2) the average particle diameter of the (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymer particles in said polymer dispersion is 1 to 100 mu m, (3) the viscosity of said polymer dispersion is 30 to 5000 mPa.s immediately after and one month after the production, (4) the polymer particles can be recognized when said polymer dispersion is diluted 10 times with distilled water and the diluted dispersion is magnified by a factor of 400 and observed with a microscope, and (5) when the pH of said diluted dispersion is adjusted to 7.0 by adding alkali, said polymer particles are dissolved to form an aqueous solution. The paper strengthening agent prepared in this manner allows to obtain paper having increased paper strength by diluting with water, coating or impregnating onto a dry paper surface or wet paper surface, and drying the treated paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/43; D21H 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/20 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 19/82 (2006.01); D21H 21/18 (2006.01); D21H 23/26 (2006.01); D21H 17/43 (2006.01); D21H 21/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/18 (2013.01); D21H 17/43 (2013.01); D21H 21/52 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H0614907 A 19940125 - SHIMADZU CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953679 A1 19991103; EP 0953679 B1 20020911; DE 69807843 D1 20021017; DE 69807843 T2 20030528; ES 2185086 T3 20030416; NO 323070 B1 20061227; NO 983091 A 19991025; NO 983091 D0 19980703; RU 2146317 C1 20000310; TW I224641 B 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140626

2015-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807843

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140626

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807843

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100625

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185086 T3

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807843 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI