Global Patent Index - EP 0953687 A3

EP 0953687 A3 2000-01-05 - Height compensation device between a manhole cover and a road surface

Title (en)

Height compensation device between a manhole cover and a road surface

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Höhenausgleich zwischen Schachtabdeckung und Fahrbahnoberfläche

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise à niveau entre un regard de chaussée et la surface d'une chaussée

Publication

EP 0953687 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108212 A

Priority

DE 19819334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953687A2] The manhole cover has a separate upper portion (1) with conical sides, while the diameter of the top of this part of the manhole cover is greater than that of its underside. The top part of the manhole has outward-sloping conical metal sides (2) matching the slope of the sides (3) of the manhole cover. A sealing ring (12) fits into the top of the space (8) between the cover and the manhole sides. This defines the width of the space and height of the cover with respect to the top of the manhole. An inwards-extending flange (5) at the bottom of the support, for the upper part of the cover, has a flexible sealing lip (14).

[origin: EP0953687A2] The manhole cover has a separate upper portion (1) with conical sides, while the diameter of the top of this part of the manhole cover is greater than that of its underside. The top part of the manhole has outward-sloping conical metal sides (2) matching the slope of the sides (3) of the manhole cover. A sealing ring (12) fits into the top of the space (8) between the cover and the manhole sides. This defines the width of the space and height of the cover with respect to the top of the manhole. An inwards-extending flange (5) at the bottom of the support, for the upper part of the cover, has a flexible sealing lip (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14; B66F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/1409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953687 A2 19991103; EP 0953687 A3 20000105; EP 0953687 B1 20060816; AT 336620 T 20060915; DE 19918944 A1 20000120; DE 59913773 D1 20060928

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHONE, GERHARD

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060816

2007-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-11-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061127

2006-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913773 P 20060928

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEIGHT LEVELLING DEVICE BETWEEN A MANHOLE COLLAR AND A ROADWAY SURFACE AND IMPLEMENTATION OF THE DEVICE IN A ROADWAY CONSTRUCTION

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02D 29/14 A, 7B 66F 19/00 B

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI