Global Patent Index - EP 0953688 A3

EP 0953688 A3 2000-03-29 - Fitting method of at least one basin, preferably ceramic, to a plate and basin and plate device

Title (en)

Fitting method of at least one basin, preferably ceramic, to a plate and basin and plate device

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einbau wenigstens eines, vorzugsweise keramischen, Beckens in eine Platte sowie Anordnung aus Becken und Platte

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le montage d'au moins une vasque, de préférence céramique, dans une plaque ainsi que dispositif formé par la vasque et la plaque

Publication

EP 0953688 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107455 A

Priority

DE 19819391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953688A2] The plate (10) may be made of natural stone, e.g. polished granite with an oval hole to accommodate an oval washbasin. (20). The basin is made of ceramics and has thick edges (22) whose side surfaces (25) slope outwards. These sloping sides of the stone plate match the slope of the sides of the basin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953688 A2 19991103; EP 0953688 A3 20000329; DE 19819391 A1 19991111; DE 19819391 C2 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI