Global Patent Index - EP 0953690 B1

EP 0953690 B1 2001-12-19 - Method for generating an electrical signal; sensor device for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Method for generating an electrical signal; sensor device for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines elektrischen Signals, Sensoreinrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens und Verwendung der Sensoreinrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour produire un signal électrique; dispositif capteur pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0953690 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103872 A

Priority

CH 94398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953690A1] The signal generation method uses a sensor device (10) with a sensor element (12) for detecting a variation in the chemical nature, composition and/or temperature of the fluid within a urinal bowl or aquarium, for providing a signal indicating switching from a passive condition to an active condition when the detected variation in the sensor element output voltage exceeds a threshold value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/10 (2006.01); E03D 11/00 (2006.01); E03D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953690 A1 19991103; EP 0953690 B1 20011219; AT 211209 T 20020115; AU 2374199 A 19991104; AU 751688 B2 20020822; DE 59900571 D1 20020131; DK 0953690 T3 20020415; ES 2170552 T3 20020801; JP H11343653 A 19991214; NZ 335350 A 20010126; TR 199900882 A2 19991021; TR 199900882 A3 19991021; US 2001035826 A1 20011101; US 6535134 B2 20030318

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: OBLAMATIK AG, CH

- Document: AT 211209 T

- Effective date: 20120418

2011-11-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: OBLAMATIK AG, CH

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-10-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110929 AND 20111005

2011-09-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OBLAMATIK AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EDO LANG,ROLAND OBRIST, , CH

- Document: DE 59900571

- Effective date: 20110803

2011-09-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OBLAMATIK AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LANG, EDO, TRIMMIS, CH; OBRIST, ROLAND, SCHARANS, CH

- Document: DE 59900571

- Effective date: 20110803

2011-09-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900571

- Representative's name: RACH, WERNER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20110803

2011-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OBLAMATIK AG

- Free text: LANG, EDO#CHURWEG 5#7203 TRIMMIS (CH) $ OBRIST, ROLAND#CHALAMANDRIN#7412 SCHARANS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- OBLAMATIK AG#GAEUGGELISTRASSE 7#7000 CHUR (CH)

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LANG EDO

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OBRIST ROLAND

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-12-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050301

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170552 T3

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900571 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211209 T 20020115

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-07-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI