Global Patent Index - EP 0953709 A3

EP 0953709 A3 2001-04-11 - Door sill and base profile for the combination with the door sill

Title (en)

Door sill and base profile for the combination with the door sill

Title (de)

Türschwelle und Sockelprofil zum Zusammenwirken mit der Türschwelle

Title (fr)

Seuil de porte et profil de socle pour la combinaison avec le seuil

Publication

EP 0953709 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108368 A

Priority

DE 19819366 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953709A2] When the door is closed, the door leaf (18) comes to rest over the threshold (1). A profiled strip (19), on the bottom of the door has an angled portion (20) which sheds rainwater away from the threshold. The threshold has a profiled strip, covering a beam (2). It has a projecting portion (3) extending out over the floor of the balcony.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E06B 1/70 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2013.01); E05C 9/18 (2013.01); E05C 9/1858 (2013.01); E06B 2001/707 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953709 A2 19991103; EP 0953709 A3 20010411; DE 19819366 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI