Global patent index - EP 0953710 A3

EP 0953710 A3 2000-12-27 - Window sill to fix on the exterior side of a window frame

Title (en)

Window sill to fix on the exterior side of a window frame

Title (de)

Fensterbank zur Befestigung an der Aussenseite eines Fensterrahmens

Title (fr)

Appui de fenêtre à fixer sur le côté extérieur d'un cadre de fenêtre

Publication

EP 0953710 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108732 A

Priority

  • DE 19819524 A
  • DE 19847317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953710A2] The windowsill cover (1) rests on the masonry (24) and consists of a portion (2) sloping gently outwards with a lip (41) extending down over the outside of the wall. There are downwards-extending groove flanges (38,39) on the underside of the flat portion, holding a pre-compressed band which supports the sill and also acts as a water seal. The inner edge of the windowsill cover is fastened to the fixed frame (5) by pins with sprung feet (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953710 A2 19991103; EP 0953710 A3 20001227; PL 332888 A1 19991108

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI