Global patent index - EP 0953713 A3

EP 0953713 A3 2000-11-08 - Closure for openings of all kinds, especially for furniture

Title (en)

Closure for openings of all kinds, especially for furniture

Title (de)

Verschluss für Öffnungen aller Art, vorzugsweise für Möbel

Title (fr)

Fermetures pour ouvertures de toutes sortes, notamment pour meubles

Publication

EP 0953713 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108012 A

Priority

DE 29807679 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953713A2] The fastening has two rectangular doors (8,9), which are parallel to each other and run in side guides (17,24). The two fastening elements are movable from their fastened position in which they are adjacent and do not overlap into an open position in which they completely or nearly completely overlap, and vice versa. The top and bottom parts of the side edges of the doors have guide-pieces (15,16,21) running in the guides belonging to each door and spaced so that the doors can overlap. The doors are joined by at least one flexible pull (31) running over a deflector roller (30) to a fixed point (35,36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/44; E05D 13/00; E05D 15/20; E05F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/20 (2006.01); E06B 3/44 (2006.01); E06B 3/92 (2006.01); E05D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/927 (2013.01); E05D 15/20 (2013.01); E06B 3/443 (2013.01); E05D 13/12 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1055 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/478 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/67 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807679 U1 19980806; AT 371081 T 20070915; DE 59914463 D1 20071004; EP 0953713 A2 19991103; EP 0953713 A3 20001108; EP 0953713 B1 20070822; ES 2291003 T3 20080216

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150422

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150422

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 371081

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150422

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914463

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140402

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2291003

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914463

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2007-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES IT

2001-07-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19990422

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990422

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990422