Global Patent Index - EP 0953717 A3

EP 0953717 A3 2000-11-02 - Spacer profile for insulating glazing unit

Title (en)

Spacer profile for insulating glazing unit

Title (de)

Abstandhalterprofil für Isolierscheibeneinheit

Title (fr)

Profilé d'écartement pour vitrage isolant

Publication

EP 0953717 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108280 A

Priority

DE 29807418 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2269108A1] A spacing profile for a spacing frame, which is to be fitted in the edge area of a double-glazing unit, forming an interspace, with a profile body of material possessing low thermal conductivity and a metal layer, which is bonded to establish a form fit with the locating walls of the profile body intended for contact with the insides of the panes, is characterized in that in each of the locating walls of the profile body a recess is provided, is which is arranged the metal layer, so that the contact surface formed by the profile body and the contact surface formed by the metal layer lie essentially in one plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/663 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/66319 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6638 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807418 U1 19990624; CA 2269108 A1 19991027; EP 0953717 A2 19991103; EP 0953717 A3 20001102; US 6061994 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050627

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-06-20 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-16 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-05-09 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILKINGTON DEUTSCHLAND AG

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI