Global patent index - EP 0953721 A3

EP 0953721 A3 2001-03-21 - Corner joint for frames

Title (en)

Corner joint for frames

Title (de)

Eckverbindung für Zargen

Title (fr)

Joint d'angle pour châssis

Publication

EP 0953721 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102984 A

Priority

DE 19818894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953721A2] Two profiled frame members (2) are butted together, with their ends miter-cut at 45 degrees to make a 90 degree corner in the frame. There are grooves in the frame profiles which accommodate corner pieces. The first corner piece (8) fits in a groove (7) and consists of a flat metal strip, bent through 90 degrees in the center. It has upstanding spring teeth (10) engaging the sides of the groove. The second corner piece (12) is an L-shaped flat strip fitting into a broad sideways-facing groove. The strip has a central rib (15) turning through 90 degrees at the corner, and upstanding spring teeth (13) at the edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/96 (2006.01); E06B 3/988 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9885 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953721 A2 19991103; EP 0953721 A3 20010321; CZ 9901493 A3 19991117; DE 19818894 A1 19991111; HU 9900435 A1 20000428; HU 9900435 D0 19990428; PL 332770 A1 19991108

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020420

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010921

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI