Global Patent Index - EP 0953763 A3

EP 0953763 A3 2000-08-16 - Manual pump

Title (en)

Manual pump

Title (de)

Handpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe manuelle

Publication

EP 0953763 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108348 A

Priority

DE 29807533 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953763A2] The pump piston is connected to a cam by a joint which is formed between the cam and pump cylinder by a pivot engaging in a recess in the piston and in a hole in the cam, and extending parallel to the axial direction of the shaft. The pump piston is located in the cylinder with a large clearance and has at least one elastic seal fitted in a slot to counteract this.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 9/14; F04B 53/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906713 U1 19991028; DE 29807533 U1 19980924; DE 59913577 D1 20060803; EP 0953763 A2 19991103; EP 0953763 A3 20000816; EP 0953763 B1 20060621

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59913577

- Representative's name: LEMCKE, BROMMER & PARTNER, PATENTANWAELTE PART, DE

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913577 P 20060803

2006-07-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 9/14 A, 7F 04B 53/14 B

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI