Global Patent Index - EP 0953807 A3

EP 0953807 A3 2000-09-13 - Viewing door for domestic appliance

Title (en)

Viewing door for domestic appliance

Title (de)

Sichttür für ein Hausgerät

Title (fr)

Porte à hublot pour appareil ménager

Publication

EP 0953807 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106905 A

Priority

DE 19818682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953807A2] The viewing door for an appliance, with a curved front pane, has a flat frame, and the front pane is fitted in place by an adapter of fine steel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2013.01); F25D 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953807 A2 19991103; EP 0953807 A3 20000913; EP 0953807 B1 20031008; BR 9901294 A 20000314; DE 19818682 C1 19991223; ES 2207054 T3 20040516; TR 9900528 A2 19991122; TR 9900528 A3 19991122

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070408

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070409

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070409

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070408

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070408

2007-01-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207054 T3

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907252 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLAS

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24C 15/04 A, 7F 24C 15/02 B, 7F 25D 23/02 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI