Global patent index - EP 0953812 A3

EP 0953812 A3 2000-01-26 - Refrigerating apparatus

Title (en)

Refrigerating apparatus

Title (de)

Kühlgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 0953812 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108078 A

Priority

DE 19818288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953812A2] The evaporators (21,22,23) are component parts of a one piece evaporator panel (20), which have a formed connecting web (24), which connects the evaporator (22) of highest cooling power with the evaporator (21) of average cooling power using flow engineering facilities, and which is led past heat insulated at the evaporator (23) of the smallest cooling power.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/02; F25D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 5/04 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F25D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 11/022 (2013.01); F25B 5/04 (2013.01); F25B 39/024 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818288 A1 19991028; DE 19818288 B4 20090430; EP 0953812 A2 19991103; EP 0953812 A3 20000126

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2000-10-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000727

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI