Global Patent Index - EP 0953999 A3

EP 0953999 A3 2000-10-25 - Procedure for adjusting a contact distance

Title (en)

Procedure for adjusting a contact distance

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung eines Kontaktabstandes

Title (fr)

Procédure pour ajuster une distance de contact

Publication

EP 0953999 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107445 A

Priority

DE 29807643 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953999A2] The device is used to adjust the distance between a first stationary contact and a second contact (1) which is movable relative to the first by at least the usual contact spacing for actuation. The second contact (1) is held in a movable component (2) so as to be axially movable at first. It is then permanently fixed in the movable component (2) when the movable component (2) is moved from a rest position by the predetermined contact distance to an operating position at the first contact. Preferably the second contact has a polygonal cross section and is held in a matching polygonal recess in the movable component (2). By rotation about the longitudinal axis under plastic deformation of the contact and/or the component, the contact can then be axially fixed in the component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/06 (2006.01); H01H 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/34 (2006.01); H01H 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/34 (2013.01); H01H 11/042 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0075 (2013.01); H01H 2011/062 (2013.01); H01H 2011/067 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49201 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807643 U1 19980716; EP 0953999 A2 19991103; EP 0953999 A3 20001025; EP 0953999 B1 20030618; EP 1267370 A1 20021218; ES 2201592 T3 20040316; JP H11339578 A 19991210; US 6563065 B1 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070427

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201592 T3

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905972 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI