Global Patent Index - EP 0954000 A3

EP 0954000 A3 2000-07-05 - Pressure switch

Title (en)

Pressure switch

Title (de)

Druckschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à pression

Publication

EP 0954000 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102978 A

Priority

DE 19818838 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0954000A2] The pressure switch has a pressure chamber (50) receiving a piston (46) which cooperates with an electrical switch (60) that has a switch mechanism (62). The mechanism is operated when a given pressure threshold is reached, and provides a relative movement between the switch contacts (94,98,100) parallel to the contact surfaces, for cleaning the surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 35/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/38 (2006.01); H01H 1/18 (2006.01); H01H 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/38 (2013.01); H01H 1/18 (2013.01); H01H 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0954000 A2 19991103; EP 0954000 A3 20000705; DE 19818838 A1 19991111; DE 19818838 C2 20000217; JP H11339612 A 19991210

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010106

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI