Global Patent Index - EP 0954048 A3

EP 0954048 A3 2000-05-24 - Bandpass filter

Title (en)

Bandpass filter

Title (de)

Bandpass-Filter

Title (fr)

Filtre passe-bande

Publication

EP 0954048 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102607 A

Priority

DE 19818947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818947C1] the bandpass filter has three coupled rectangular hollow vol. resonators, two coupled via their narrow sides via at least one coupling aperture to a broad side of the third. A further inductive coupling aperture is arranged between the adjacent broad sides of the first two resonators immediately adjacent to their narrow sides contg. the inductive coupling apertures of the third resonator

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0075498 A1 19830330 - THOMSON CSF [FR]
  • [A] WILLIAMS A E: "AN ODD ORDER ELLIPTIC FUNCTION NARROW-BANDPASS MICROWAVE FILTER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE,GB,SEVENOAKS, MICROWAVE EXHIBITIONS, vol. CONF. 8, 4 September 1978 (1978-09-04) - 8 September 1978 (1978-09-08), ROME (IT), pages 329 - 333, XP002014111
  • [A] A.E. ATIA ET AL.: "GENERAL TE011-MODE WAVEGUIDE BANDPASS FILTERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES., vol. 24, no. 10, October 1976 (1976-10-01), IEEE INC. NEW YORK., US, pages 640 - 648, XP002134034, ISSN: 0018-9480

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818947 C1 19990506; EP 0954048 A2 19991103; EP 0954048 A3 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI