Global Patent Index - EP 0954057 B1

EP 0954057 B1 2002-11-27 - Connecting device for coaxial cable

Title (en)

Connecting device for coaxial cable

Title (de)

Anschlusseinrichtung für Koaxialkabel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement pour cable coaxial

Publication

EP 0954057 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114543 A

Priority

  • EP 99114543 A
  • EP 96938931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0954057A1] The device has a plug or coupling part (1) in which the inner and outer conductor connection with the coaxial cable (11) is made. The plug or coupling part (1) is angled for an angled plug connection of the cable in a conductor (10) with the inner conductor (4) of the plug or coupling part (1). The connection is made by an insulation displacement clamp element (6) without solder and screws. The cable outer conductor (15) is connected to an angled connector part (3) of the plug or coupling part (1) by means of a crimp element (18). Alternatively, for making a straight plug connection of the cable in a conductor (28) with the inner conductor (29) of the plug or coupling part (20) a straight plug or coupling part (20) is used. The connection is made by means of a crimp or solder connection. The cable outer conductor is connected in a clamp zone at a straight end (21) of the coupling part (20) by means of clamp elements (26). The latter can be radially inserted into the straight end or passed through the cable cladding (22) and contact the cable outer conductor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 9/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/053 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0954057 A1 19991103; EP 0954057 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090910

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090910

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609929 20030109

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 852079

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2000-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONNECTING DEVICE FOR COAXIAL CABLE

1999-11-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 852079

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI