Global Patent Index - EP 0954063 A3

EP 0954063 A3 2000-07-12 - Locking means for an electrical connector

Title (en)

Locking means for an electrical connector

Title (de)

Verrieglungsvorrichtung für elektrischen Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique à verrouillage

Publication

EP 0954063 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99400400 A

Priority

FR 9805574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0954063A2] The flexible finger connection comprises of male (77) and female (85) connectors. The male and connectors contain wire clamps to secure the wire in contact with the connectors. To join the connectors the male connection simply clips into the female connector to complete the conductible connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629; H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6272 (2013.01); H01R 13/62933 (2013.01); H01R 13/501 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0954063 A2 19991103; EP 0954063 A3 20000712; FR 2778275 A1 19991105; FR 2778275 B1 20000721

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030812

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-03-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991228;RO PAYMENT 19991228;SI PAYMENT 19991228

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT PAYMENT 19991228;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19991228;SI PAYMENT 19991228

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LOCKING MEANS FOR AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR

1999-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LOCKING MEANS FOR AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI