Global Patent Index - EP 0954092 A3

EP 0954092 A3 2001-12-05 - Drive control apparatus for electric synchronous machine having field winding

Title (en)

Drive control apparatus for electric synchronous machine having field winding

Title (de)

Antriebsregelvorrichtung für elektrische Synchronmaschine mit Feldwicklung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour l'entraînement d'une machine synchrone avec enroulement de champ

Publication

EP 0954092 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107657 A

Priority

JP 11950898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0954092A2] A drive control apparatus for an electric synchronous machine (1000) is composed of armature current control means (100) and transient operation detection means (500). When the synchronous machine (1000) is intended to increase power in a transient operation, the current control means (100) supplies the armature winding (1110) with compensation current to cancel counter-electromotive force formed when field current is supplied to the field winding (1230) through a mutual inductance of the field winding (1230) and the armature winding (1110). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02P 21/00; B60L 15/02; B60L 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02P 23/00 (2006.01); B60L 11/12 (2006.01); B60L 15/02 (2006.01); H02K 1/22 (2006.01); H02K 1/24 (2006.01); H02K 11/00 (2006.01); H02P 27/06 (2006.01); H02K 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60L 11/12 (2013.01); B60L 15/025 (2013.01); B60L 15/2009 (2013.01); H02K 1/243 (2013.01); H02K 11/20 (2016.01); H02K 11/21 (2016.01); H02K 11/225 (2016.01); H02K 11/24 (2016.01); H02K 21/044 (2013.01); B60L 2220/14 (2013.01); H02K 19/22 (2013.01); Y02T 10/641 (2013.01); Y02T 10/643 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7005 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7077 (2013.01); Y02T 10/72 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7275 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0954092 A2 19991103; EP 0954092 A3 20011205; EP 0954092 B1 20040804; DE 69919065 D1 20040909; DE 69919065 T2 20050714; JP 3899668 B2 20070328; JP H11313498 A 19991109; US 6118247 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100416

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919065 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 02P 21/00 A, 7B 60L 15/02 B, 7B 60L 15/20 B

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI