Global Patent Index - EP 0954320 A4

EP 0954320 A4 2001-04-04 - INOSITOL POLYPHOSPHATE DERIVATIVES AND METHODS OF USING SAME

Title (en)

INOSITOL POLYPHOSPHATE DERIVATIVES AND METHODS OF USING SAME

Title (de)

DERIVATE VON INOSITOLPOLYPHOSPHAT UND METHODEN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE POLYPHOSPHATES D'INOSITOL ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0954320 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97942600 A

Priority

  • US 9716679 W
  • US 71712296 A
  • US 92683197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811901A1] The present invention provides compositions that are cell permeable antagonists of inositol polyphosphates. In addition, the invention provides methods for enhancing chloride ion secretion from a cell by contacting the cells with cell permeable antagonists of inositol polyphosphates. The invention also provides methods for enhancing chloride ion secretion in an individual by administering cell permeable antagonists of inositol polyphosphates to the individual. The invention additionally provides methods for alleviating a sign or symptom associated with cystic fibrosis in an individual by administering a cell permeable antagonist of inositol polyphosphates to the individual. The invention also provides compositions that are cell permeable agonists of inositol polyphosphates. In addition, the invention provides methods for decreasing chloride ion secretion from a cell by contacting the cell with cell permeable agonists of inositol polyphosphates. The invention also provides methods for decreasing chloride ion secretion in an individual by administering cell permeable agonists of inositol polyphosphates to the individual. The invention additionally provides methods for alleviating a sign or symptom associated with secretory diarrhea in an individual by administering cell permeable agonists of inositol polyphosphates to the individual.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/685; A61K 31/66; C07F 9/117

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/6615 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07F 9/117 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/6615 (2013.01); A61K 31/683 (2013.01); C07F 9/117 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9423724 A1 19941027 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]
  • [Y] EP 0262227 A1 19880406 - MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]
  • [XY] ROEMER ET AL: "SYNTHESIS OF D MYO INOSITOL 3,4,5,6 AND 1,4,5,6 TETRAKISPHOSPHATE ANALOGUES AND THEIR MEMBRANE PERMEANT DERIVATIVES", J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., 1995, pages 411 - 412, XP000916568
  • [Y] ISMAILOV I. ET AL: "A BIOLOGIC FUNCTION FOR AN "ORPHAN" MESSENGER: D-MYO-INOSITOL 3,4,5,6-TETRAKISPHOSPHATE SELECTIVELY BLOCKS EPITHELIAL CALCIUM-ACTIVATED CHLORIDE CHANNELS.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, vol. 93, no. 19, 1996 - 17 September 1996 (1996-09-17), pages 10505 - 9, XP000919161
  • [Y] XIE W. ET AL: "INOSITOL 3,4,5,6-TETRAKISPHOSPHATE INHIBITS THE CALMODULIN-DEPENDENT PROTEIN KINASE II-ACTIVATED CHLORIDE CONDUCTANCE IN T84 COLONIC EPITHELIAL CELLS.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 271, no. 24, 1996 - 14 June 1996 (1996-06-14), pages 14092 - 97, XP000919198
  • [Y] LU, PEI-JUNG ET AL: "MOLECULAR INTERACTIONS OF ENDOGENOUS D-MYO-INOSITOL PHOSPHATES WITH THE INTRACELLULAR D-MYO-INOSITOL 1,4,5-TRISPHOSPHATE RECOGNITION SITE.", BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 33, no. 38, 1994, USA, pages 11586 - 97, XP000916576
  • [A] SAWADA T ET AL: "Synthesis of 1-O-Alkyl- and 1-O-Acyl-myo-inositol 3, 4, 5-trisphosphates as Novel Analogues of Phosphatidyl-myo-inositol 3, 4, 5-trisphosphate", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 5, no. 19, 5 October 1995 (1995-10-05), pages 2263 - 2266, XP004135296, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • [A] TRAYNOR-KAPLAN ET AL: "Protein Kinase C activity does not mediate the inhibitory effect of Carbachol on chloride secretion by T84 cells.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 5, no. 1, 1994, pages C1224 - C1230, XP000916572
  • [A] STAUB ET AL.: "Treatment of vasogenic brain edema with the novel Cl transport inhibitor Torasemide.", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, vol. 11, no. 6, 1994, pages 679 - 690, XP000916577
  • See also references of WO 9811901A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811901 A1 19980326; AU 4426697 A 19980414; AU 721150 B2 20000622; CA 2267348 A1 19980326; CN 1145489 C 20040414; CN 1239894 A 19991229; CN 1478783 A 20040303; EP 0954320 A1 19991110; EP 0954320 A4 20010404; JP 2002524016 A 20020730; KR 20060028630 A 20060330

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1023938

2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070402

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/685 A, 7A 61K 31/66 B, 7C 07F 9/117 B

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INOLOGIC, INC.

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, SAN DIEGO

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, SAN DIEGO

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INOLOGIC, INC.

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INOLOGIC, INC.

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, SAN DIEGO

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990414

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE