Global Patent Index - EP 0954390 A4

EP 0954390 A4 2000-04-19 - FUME HOOD HAVING A BI-STABLE VORTEX

Title (en)

FUME HOOD HAVING A BI-STABLE VORTEX

Title (de)

RAUCHABZUG MIT BISTABILER WIRBELSTRÖMUNG

Title (fr)

HOTTE A TURBULENCES BISTABLES

Publication

EP 0954390 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98902812 A

Priority

  • US 9800956 W
  • US 3599797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831481A1] The flow of air through a fume hood (78) is optimized by producing a bi-stable vortex within the vortex chamber of the fume hood regardless of sash (18) movement. A bi-stable fume hood optimizes capture face velocity to minimize backflow of fume laden air through the hood sash opening. This bi-stable vortex fume hood utilizes a vortex pressure control system to reposition top, center, and bottom slot openings (32, 34, 36) of a baffle in the hood. This baffle moves the bi-stable vortex away from the face when the sash is fully opened and creates a clearing action near the work surface as the sash is closed. An airfoil (76) is placed inside the fume hood chamber and the airfoil has multiple entry pattern, one of which turns the vortex up and away from the open sash window. The other creates flow which washes the work surface of the hood. The interior portion of the vortex chamber utilizes a turning vane (65) in order to decrease dynamic losses and increases bi-stable vortex stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/007 (2006.01); B08B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9831481A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831481 A1 19980723; WO 9831481 A8 19990422; AU 5961698 A 19980807; DE 69814036 D1 20030605; DE 69814036 T2 20040408; DK 0954390 T3 20030728; EP 0954390 A1 19991110; EP 0954390 A4 20000419; EP 0954390 B1 20030502; ES 2197460 T3 20040101; JP 2001518174 A 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100117

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-12-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69814036

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110116

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110116

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100101

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FLOW SAFE INC. AND LABCRAFTERS INC. JOINTLY

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DELUCA ROBERT A.

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MORRIS ROBERT H.

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100208

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197460 T3

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814036 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2000-04-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990617

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB NL SE