Global Patent Index - EP 0954399 A4

EP 0954399 A4 2003-06-04 - MULTI-CHANNEL STRUCTURES AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING SUCH STRUCTURES

Title (en)

MULTI-CHANNEL STRUCTURES AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING SUCH STRUCTURES

Title (de)

MEHRKANALIGE STRUKTUREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCHER STRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURES MULTICANAUX ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0954399 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97945635 A

Priority

  • US 9720418 W
  • US 74373196 A
  • US 74435996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819812A1] A method for making multi-channel structures suitable for use as filters, catalyst carriers or the like. A composite rod (11) comprising an outer shell (12) and an inner core (13) is formed of respective mixtures of powders. The mixture for the outer shell comprises a sinterable powdered structural material such as ceramics, metals, intermetallics, and a powdered binder. The inner core comprises a powdered channel-forming filler material that can differentially be removed from the structural material of the shell. The composite rod (11) may be deformed, as by extrusion, to reduce its diameter. A bundle (14) of composite rods (11A) is assembled and deformed, as by extrusion, to reduce the diameter of the bundle (14) and of its component composite rods. Further bundles (17) of the reduced diameter bundles (14A) of composite rods may be likewise deformed by extrusion to reduce further the diameter of the component composite rods of the successive bundles, thereby also increasing the number of such rods per given cross section area of the bundle. The final assembly of bundles (17A) is consolidated and the binder is removed, as by heating, followed by removal of the inner cores of the composite rods of the assembly of bundles and sintering of the remaining structure of ceramic or metal, as the case may be. In certain embodiments, the material of the inner core may be removed by heating it in the course of heating the structure to perform the sintering step. In other embodiments, the binder and/or filler material may be removed by means of a suitable solvent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/11; B01D 39/20; B01D 63/06; B01D 69/08; B01J 35/04; C04B 35/00; C04B 37/00; F28F 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 38/06 (2006.01); B01D 39/20 (2006.01); B01D 63/06 (2006.01); B01D 69/08 (2006.01); B01J 35/04 (2006.01); B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 5/00 (2006.01); C04B 35/00 (2006.01); C04B 37/00 (2006.01); F28F 21/04 (2006.01); B29C 43/00 (2006.01); G01N 30/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/2075 (2013.01); B01D 63/066 (2013.01); B01D 69/08 (2013.01); B01J 35/04 (2013.01); B22F 3/1103 (2013.01); B22F 3/1121 (2013.01); B22F 3/1134 (2013.01); B32B 18/00 (2013.01); C04B 35/00 (2013.01); F28F 21/04 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); B29C 43/006 (2013.01); B29C 2043/3668 (2013.01); C04B 2235/6562 (2013.01); C04B 2235/6567 (2013.01); C04B 2237/343 (2013.01); C04B 2237/348 (2013.01); C04B 2237/365 (2013.01); C04B 2237/62 (2013.01); C04B 2237/66 (2013.01); C04B 2237/76 (2013.01); G01N 30/60 (2013.01); G01N 30/6043 (2013.01); G01N 30/6052 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G01N 30/60 + G01N 30/466
  2. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/114

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819812 A1 19980514; AU 5106598 A 19980529; CA 2309201 A1 19980514; EP 0954399 A1 19991110; EP 0954399 A4 20030604; JP 2001504077 A 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041214

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22F 3/11 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 39/20 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 63/06 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 69/08 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 35/04 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 04B 35/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 04B 37/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 28F 21/04 B

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TUCHINSKIY, LEV, J.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALLIA, ROBERT, A.

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE