Global Patent Index - EP 0954639 B1

EP 0954639 B1 2002-11-13 - MOULDED BRICK BUILDING SET

Title (en)

MOULDED BRICK BUILDING SET

Title (de)

FORMSTEIN-BAUSATZ

Title (fr)

JEU DE CONSTRUCTION A BRIQUES MOULEES

Publication

EP 0954639 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98904117 A

Priority

  • DE 19702650 A
  • DE 19705298 A
  • EP 9800334 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832925A1] A moulded brick building set is inserted in a pavement. In order to provide various laying possibilities with bricks of various sizes, the moulded bricks have on their side walls mutually adapted spacers which mesh with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2013.01); E01C 2201/02 (2013.01); E01C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832925 A1 19980730; AT 227791 T 20021115; CZ 293089 B6 20040218; CZ 9902629 A3 20000315; EP 0954639 A1 19991110; EP 0954639 B1 20021113; HU 0001021 A2 20000828; HU 0001021 A3 20000928; HU 227063 B1 20100628; PL 334804 A1 20000313; SI 20080 A 20000430; SK 100799 A3 20000118; SK 285495 B6 20070301

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227791 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEIWILLER ROLF

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806271 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227791 T 20021115

2002-04-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010817

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL