Global Patent Index - EP 0954667 B1

EP 0954667 B1 2001-04-11 - LOCK WITH CATCH BOLT FOR DOOR OR WINDOW

Title (en)

LOCK WITH CATCH BOLT FOR DOOR OR WINDOW

Title (de)

SCHLOSS MIT FALLE FÜR TÜR ODER FENSTER

Title (fr)

SERRURE A PENE DEMI-TOUR POUR PORTE OU FENETRE

Publication

EP 0954667 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98904097 A

Priority

  • DE 29701070 U
  • EP 9800264 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2277836A1] The invention relates to a lock with a catch bolt (41) having a bar (65) which can be pushed through a nut that turns by application of a latch or a key, in such a way that said bar actuates an additional push of the catch bolt (41) into a locked position, thus blocking the catch bolt in this locked position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04; E05B 55/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/041 (2013.01); E05C 9/047 (2013.01); E05B 55/00 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5221 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5381 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0843 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0971 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0976 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1016 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1028 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29701070 U1 19980520; CA 2277836 A1 19980730; CA 2277836 C 20021217; EP 0954667 A1 19991110; EP 0954667 B1 20010411; US 6247342 B1 20010619; WO 9832940 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070119

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080119

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800623 20010517

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT