Global Patent Index - EP 0954722 B1

EP 0954722 B1 2001-05-23 - WATER-COOLED FIRING GRATE

Title (en)

WATER-COOLED FIRING GRATE

Title (de)

MIT WASSER GEKÜHLTER VERBRENNUNGSROST

Title (fr)

GRILLE DE COMBUSTION A REFROIDISSEMENT PAR EAU

Publication

EP 0954722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97913176 A

Priority

  • DE 19650742 A
  • EP 9705893 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19650742C1] Disclosed is a water-cooled firing grate (1), comprising several blocks of grate bars (3) extending across the width of the grate, each block consisting of multiple grate bars (8a, 8b, 8c), wherein each grate (8) has a meander-shaped channel (10) in addition to several cut-in grate slots (11) inside, whereby the grate bars (8) are interconnected by screwable connecting members (16) in such a way that a grate slot (18) is formed in-between every two grate bars (8). A connecting channel (17) runs inside the connecting members (16) linking the meander-shaped channels (10) of two grate bars (8) wherein the grate bars (8) which are positioned on the limits of the grate (9a, 9b) have screwable inlet and outlet elements (15a, 15b) through which water used as a liquid coolant is fed and discharged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 1/02; F23H 7/08; F23H 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 1/02 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23H 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 1/02 (2013.01); F23H 7/08 (2013.01); F23H 17/00 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19650742 C1 19980219; AT 201501 T 20010615; DK 0954722 T3 20010910; EP 0954722 A1 19991110; EP 0954722 B1 20010523; ES 2159126 T3 20010916; JP 2001505295 A 20010417; JP 3990463 B2 20071010; US 6145451 A 20001114; WO 9825079 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171023

2017-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-30 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20171024

2017-10-25 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171023

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703629

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2013-03-26 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-01-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121210

2012-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT, CH

2012-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AE AND E LENTJES GMBH, DE

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AE & E LENTJES GMBH, 40880 RATINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59703629

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703629

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BECKER & MUELLER, DE

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-07-25 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120717

2012-06-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703629

- Representative's name: BECKER UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2011-07-13 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-07-11 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AE & E LENTJES GMBH

- Effective date: 20110629

2011-06-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-04-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AE & E LENTJES GNMBH

- Free text: LENTJES GMBH#DANIEL-GOLDBACH-STRASSE 19#40880 RATINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- AE & E LENTJES GNMBH#DANIEL-GOLDBACH-STRASSE 19#40880 RATINGEN (DE)

2011-04-29 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2011-04-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LENTJES GMBH, 40880 RATINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59703629

- Effective date: 20110207

2008-01-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-01-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: LENTJES G.M.B.H.DANIEL-GOLDBACH-STRASSE 19, D-4088

- Effective date: 20071004

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: LENTJES G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20071004

2007-12-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LENTJES GMBH

- Effective date: 20070829

2007-12-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GEA GROUP AG

2007-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LENTJES GMBH

- Free text: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG#BOCKENHEIMER LANDSTRASSE 73-77#60325 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LENTJES GMBH#DANIEL-GOLDBACH-STRASSE 19#40880 RATINGEN (DE)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159126 T3

2001-09-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703629 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201501 T 20010615

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001018

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE