Global Patent Index - EP 0954740 B1

EP 0954740 B1 2001-05-09 - SAFETY MECHANISM FOR A FIRING PIN

Title (en)

SAFETY MECHANISM FOR A FIRING PIN

Title (de)

SCHLAGBOLZENSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SURETE POUR PERCUTEUR

Publication

EP 0954740 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98905342 A

Priority

  • DE 19702374 A
  • EP 9800376 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19702374A1] The present invention relates to a safety mechanism for the firing pin (5) of an anvil trigger system (5), said firing pin (5) being fitted with a spring (9) which, when in a position of rest, presses against a rear stop (13) while keeping at a distance of the cartridge primer which is located prior thereto and designed with a back taper (11) close to its back end. The safety device includes a spring-fitted mechanism (29, 31, 33) which, when in a position of rest, engages with a hammer spur (29) into the back taper, thereby maintaining the firing pin (7) in a position of rest. This locking part enters the travelling path of the anvil (5) in such a way that the latter (5), by meeting with the back end of the firing pin (7), first meets with the chamfer (35), pushes it aside against the spring effect, thereby releasing the cartridge (3). The safety mechanism (21, 31, 33) is designed as a single-level leaf spring (21) and presents a spring leg (23) extending from the hammer spur (29) forwards and taking its bearing before the firing pin back end. The spring leg extends to the area of the firing pin (27) front end, designed as an extraction tooth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 15/12 (2006.01); F41A 17/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/64 (2013.01); F41A 15/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19702374 A1 19980730; DE 19702374 C2 20010301; AT 201097 T 20010515; CA 2278214 A1 19980730; CA 2278214 C 20040824; EP 0954740 A1 19991110; EP 0954740 B1 20010509; ES 2157655 T3 20010816; US 6145234 A 20001114; WO 9833035 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100124

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100123

2011-03-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100123

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100123

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100123

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HECKLER & KOCH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH

- Free text: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE)

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157655 T3

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800688 20010613

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201097 T 20010515

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI