Global Patent Index - EP 0954992 A3

EP 0954992 A3 2000-09-27 - Helmet provided with aerating holes and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Helmet provided with aerating holes and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Helm mit Belüftungsöffnungen und Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben

Title (fr)

Casque muni d'orifices d'aération et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0954992 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98121680 A

Priority

IT TO980389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0954992A2] The invention concerns an helmet provided with holes for aerating the user's head in which is provided a cap (1) having holes (10', 10'', 10''') formed by two cap portions (1a-1d), each having a plurality of holes having axes substantially parallel to each other. The invention refers moreover to the process for manufacturing said helmet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/12; A42B 3/28; A42C 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/12 (2006.01); A42B 3/28 (2006.01); A42C 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/281 (2013.01); A42B 3/12 (2013.01); A42C 2/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0954992 A2 19991110; EP 0954992 A3 20000927; IT TO980389 A1 19991108

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI